This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:27:14 (UTC).

Marlen Guerrero - v. - Luis E. Velasquez et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Marlen Guerrero filed an Other lawsuit against Luis E Velasquez. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marlen Guerrero

Defendants

Luis E. Velasquez

Alfredo Gonzalez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ODIERNO, LEE JOSEPH

Attorney at The Odierno Law Firm, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

CHENERY, TINA M.

Attorney at Russo, Apoznanski & Tambasco

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Odierno, L.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Odierno, L.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Chenery, T. - filed by Russo & Tambasco; Filed: 10/02/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Odierno, L.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Chenery, T. - filed by Russo & Tambasco; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Chenery, T. - filed by Tobin, T.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Chenery, T. - filed by Russo & Tambasco; Filed: 10/02/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Odierno, L.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Chenery, T. - filed by Tobin, T.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Chenery, T. - filed by Russo & Tambasco; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Chenery, T. - filed by Tobin, T.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Chenery, T. - filed by Tobin, T.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Odierno, L.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Chenery, T. - filed by Russo & Tambasco; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Chenery, T. - filed by Russo & Tambasco; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Odierno, L.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Odierno, L.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Chenery, T. - filed by Russo & Tambasco; Filed: 10/02/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Chenery, T. - filed by Russo & Tambasco; Filed: 10/02/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Odierno, L.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less