This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 07:39:46 (UTC).

Mark Zames et al - v. - Scalice Custom Homes and Remodeling, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 Mark Zames filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Scalice Custom Homes and Remodeling, LLC. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gerard J Neri. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2518

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gerard J Neri

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Phyllis Zames

Mark Zames

Defendants and Petitioners

Wadsworth Mechanical, Inc.

Scalice Custom Homes and Remodeling, LLC

Randy Vadala d/b/a Randy Vadala HVAC & Construction Services

Breathe Easy of CNY, Inc.

Defendant and Respondent

Randy Vadala d/b/a Randy Vadala HVAC & Construction Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PRIAL, VICTOR L.

Attorney at Smith, Sovik, Kendrick & Sugnet, P.C.

SMITH, EDWARD J.

Attorney at SMITH, SOVIK, KENDRICK & SUGNET, P.C.

Petitioner Attorney

ALAN JOSEPH DEPETERS

Defendant Attorneys

GUMAER, MATTHEW DAVID

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

DEPETERS, ALAN JOSEPH

Attorney at Alan De Peters

WHRITENOUR, MATTHEW E.

Attorney at Knych & Whritenour, LLC

LENHARD, MATTHEW ALAN

Attorney at Rupp Baase

Respondent Attorney

MATTHEW E. WHRITENOUR

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2020; Received: 05/07/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Confirming discovery deadlines to be So Ordered

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Confirming discovery deadlines to be So Ordered; Filed By: Smith, E.; Filed: 05/07/2020; Received: 05/07/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/05/2020; Received: 05/05/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT ADR adj to May 4, 2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT ADR adj to May 4, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/24/2020; Received: 03/24/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE ltr to pltf's counsel re discovery issues

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE ltr to pltf's counsel re discovery issues; Filed By: Gumaer, M.; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Discovery Conference Rescheduled to 2:45 p.m.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Discovery Conference Rescheduled to 2:45 p.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Whritenour, M.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference Scheduled on 3/6/20

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference Scheduled on 3/6/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Lenhard Correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Lenhard Correspondence; Filed By: Lenhard, M.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Gumaer, M.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Preliminary Conference scheduled for January 9, 2018.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Preliminary Conference scheduled for January 9, 2018.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gumaer, M.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gumaer, M.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Gumaer, M.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Depeters, A.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon Wadsworth Mechanical, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon Wadsworth Mechanical, Inc.; Filed By: Smith, E.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon Scalice Custom Homes and Remodeling, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon Scalice Custom Homes and Remodeling, LLC; Filed By: Smith, E.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Smith, E.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

133 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2020; Received: 05/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Confirming discovery deadlines to be So Ordered; Filed By: Smith, E.; Filed: 05/07/2020; Received: 05/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/05/2020; Received: 05/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT ADR adj to May 4, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/24/2020; Received: 03/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE ltr to pltf's counsel re discovery issues; Filed By: Gumaer, M.; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Discovery Conference Rescheduled to 2:45 p.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Whritenour, M.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference Scheduled on 3/6/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Lenhard Correspondence; Filed By: Lenhard, M.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Plaintiff's Supplemental Response; Filed By: Lenhard, M.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Compliance Conference on 8-13-18 at 10:30 a.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Gumaer, M.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Preliminary Conference scheduled for January 9, 2018.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gumaer, M.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gumaer, M.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Gumaer, M.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Depeters, A.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon Wadsworth Mechanical, Inc.; Filed By: Smith, E.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon Scalice Custom Homes and Remodeling, LLC; Filed By: Smith, E.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Smith, E.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less