This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:56:01 (UTC).

MARK TAYLOR - v. - BARBARA WIGGINS

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 MARK TAYLOR filed an Other lawsuit against BARBARA WIGGINS. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Taylor

Defendant

Barbara Wiggins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IKHILOV, Z. ERIK

Attorney at IKHILOV & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

LEREBOURS, KETSIA

Attorney at JAMES G. BILELLO & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Compliance Conference Order

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Compliance Conference Order; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/27/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Answer with Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Answer with Demands; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Preliminary Conference Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Note of Issue Final Conference

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Note of Issue Final Conference; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2); Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Note of Issue

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Note of Issue; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 9/18/18

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 9/18/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/27/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Demand for Discovery

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Demand for Discovery; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #2) order dtd 1/30/2020 signed by Hon. Colon

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #2) order dtd 1/30/2020 signed by Hon. Colon; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #2) order dtd 1/30/2020 signed by Hon. Colon; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2); Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Note of Issue; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Demand for Discovery; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Note of Issue Final Conference; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Compliance Conference Order; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Answer with Demands; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2) Good Faith Affirmation; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by Lee, R.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Defendant's Answer; Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 9/18/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/27/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Lerebours, K. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/27/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ikhilov, Z.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less