Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 19:01:11 (UTC).

MARINER FINANCE, LLC v. SHAWNA A. JACOBS et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 MARINER FINANCE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHAWNA A JACOBS. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINER FINANCE LLC

Defendants

David Spencer

Shawna A Jacobs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GITLIN, ROBERT BRIAN

Attorney at ROBERT B GITLIN

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 CONTRACT-NON CREDIT CARD Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 CONTRACT-NON CREDIT CARD Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING-SPENCER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING-SPENCER; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING-JACOBS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING-JACOBS; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/10/2019

AFFIRMATION MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS-NON-CREDIT CARD

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS-NON-CREDIT CARD; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/10/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SPENCER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SPENCER; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JACOBS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JACOBS; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 CONTRACT-NON CREDIT CARD Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING-SPENCER; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING-JACOBS; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS-NON-CREDIT CARD; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/10/2019; Received: 11/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SPENCER; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JACOBS; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less