Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 12:07:14 (UTC).

MARINER FINANCE, LLC v. MICHAEL LYNN YOUNG

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 MARINER FINANCE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL LYNN YOUNG. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0972

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINER FINANCE, LLC

Defendant

Michael Lynn Young

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GITLIN, ROBERT BRIAN

Attorney at ROBERT B GITLIN

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 CONTRACT-NON -CREDIT CARD

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 CONTRACT-NON -CREDIT CARD; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

AFFIRMATION MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS-NON-CREDIT CARD

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS-NON-CREDIT CARD; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 04/20/2019; Received: 04/20/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 CONTRACT-NON -CREDIT CARD; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS-NON-CREDIT CARD; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 04/20/2019; Received: 04/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less