This case was last updated from Genesee County Courts on 05/19/2020 at 15:11:27 (UTC).

MARINER FINANCE, LLC v. GARY D. BESTOR

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 MARINER FINANCE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GARY D BESTOR. This case was filed in Genesee County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **7146

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Genesee, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINER FINANCE, LLC

Defendant

Gary D Bestor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GITLIN, ROBERT BRIAN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/30/2018; Received: 11/30/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 12/15/2018; Received: 12/15/2018

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF DEFAULT

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF DEFAULT; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

AFFIRMATION MILITARY

AFFIRMATION MILITARY; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION MILITARY; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF DEFAULT; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 12/15/2018; Received: 12/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gitlin, R.; Filed: 11/30/2018; Received: 11/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less