This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 03:19:44 (UTC).

Marie Morra et al v. Flag Container Services inc.

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Marie Morra filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Flag Container Services inc. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Kim Dollard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Kim Dollard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ralph Morra

Marie Morra

Defendant

Flag Container Services inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DECOLATOR, JOSEPH L

Attorney at DECOLATOR, COHEN & DIPRISCO LLP

Defendant Attorney

SCHNITTMAN, ERIC ALAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KOWALSKI & DE VITO

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter regarding discovery

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter regarding discovery; Filed By: Decolator, J.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Decolator, J.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Decolator, J.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

BILL OF PARTICULARS

BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Decolator, J.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

ANSWER Def's Ans to Plaintiff Complaint

ANSWER Def's Ans to Plaintiff Complaint; Filed By: Schnittman, E.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Decolator, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Decolator, J.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter regarding discovery; Filed By: Decolator, J.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Decolator, J.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Decolator, J.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Decolator, J.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Def's Ans to Plaintiff Complaint; Filed By: Schnittman, E.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Decolator, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Decolator, J.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less