Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 16:20:22 (UTC).

MARIA PRUDENCIO - v. - NASSAU HEALTH CARE CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 MARIA PRUDENCIO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against NASSAU HEALTH CARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Prudencio

Defendants

John-jane Doe

NASSAU HEALTH CARE CORPORATION d/b/a NASSAU UNIVERISTY MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NICHOLS, REGINA CANE

Attorney at NICHOLS & CANE LLP

Defendant Attorney

MCHUGH, LESLIE

Attorney at Lawrence, Worden, Rainis & Bard, P.C.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS by regular mail upon pro se plf

NOTICE OF ENTRY

order with notice of entry

ORDER - DISMISSAL

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

signed OSC to be relieved with affidavits of service

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

affidavit of service by electronic filing

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

affirmation in partial opposition

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

--none--

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

affidavit of service by electronic filing

ANSWER

verified answer

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS by regular mail upon pro se plf; Filed By: Mchugh, L.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY order with notice of entry; Filed By: Mchugh, L.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) signed OSC to be relieved with affidavits of service; Filed By: Nichols, R.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Nichols, R.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2018; Received: 09/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) affidavit of service by electronic filing; Filed By: Mchugh, L.; Filed: 08/30/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) affirmation in partial opposition; Filed By: Mchugh, L.; Filed: 08/30/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #1); Filed By: Nichols, R.; Filed: 08/28/2018; Received: 08/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/21/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Nichols, R.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Nichols, R.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nichols, R.; Filed: 06/11/2017; Received: 06/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of service by electronic filing; Filed By: Mchugh, L.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER verified answer; Filed By: Mchugh, L.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Nichols, R.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Nichols, R.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less