This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:15:00 (UTC).

Maria Garcia v. The Wendy's Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 Maria Garcia filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Wendy's Company. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Garcia

Defendants

The Estate of Kevin Rasquinha

Brookshire Equities, LLC

The Wendy's Company

Wen-Kev Third Avenue, LLC

Briad Restaurant Group, L.L.C.

Briad Wenco, L.L.C.

Willow Run Foods, Inc.

200 Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIS, JASON L

Attorney at Paris & Chaikin PLC

Defendant Attorneys

SULLIVAN, PATRICIA A

Attorney at BARRY MCTIERNAN & MOORE

TOOMEY, JAMES J

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES J. TOOMEY

SHIN, JOHN H

Attorney at GANNON ROSENFARB & DROSSMAN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) answer to cross claim

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) answer to cross claim; Filed By: Sullivan, P.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)

NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C); Filed By: Paris, J.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Paris, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

ANSWER Answer to Cross Claims with Cross Claims

ANSWER Answer to Cross Claims with Cross Claims; Filed By: Sullivan, P.; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A lease

EXHIBIT(S) - A lease; Filed By: Sullivan, P.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer to Verified Complaint

ANSWER Verified Answer to Verified Complaint; Filed By: Sullivan, P.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) verified answer with cross-claims

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) verified answer with cross-claims; Filed By: Shin, J.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Paris, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Paris, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Paris, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Paris, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Paris, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) answer to cross claim; Filed By: Sullivan, P.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C); Filed By: Paris, J.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Paris, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Paris, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent to Change Attorney; Filed By: Shin, J.; Filed: 01/24/2018; Received: 01/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Cross Claims with Cross Claims; Filed By: Sullivan, P.; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A lease; Filed By: Sullivan, P.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer to Verified Complaint; Filed By: Sullivan, P.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) verified answer with cross-claims; Filed By: Shin, J.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Paris, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Paris, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Paris, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Paris, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Paris, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less