This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:44:24 (UTC).

MARGIE FELICIANO - v. - THE CITY OF NEW YORK

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 MARGIE FELICIANO filed an Other lawsuit against THE CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Margie Feliciano

Defendant

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KATZ, JOSEPH

Attorney at Sacco & Fillas, LLP.

LEVIN, BRAD SEAN

Attorney at NASS ROPER & LEVIN, P.C.

COWIE, KEVIN KEITH

Attorney at Kevin K. Cowie, Esq.

RIBAKOVE, JEREMY SAMUEL

Attorney at New York City Law Department

Defendant Attorneys

FALCONE, KURTIS ROBERT

Attorney at New York City Law Department

WILCOSKY, R. MITCHELL

Attorney at NEW YORK CITY LAW DEPARTMENT, BROOKLYN TORTS DIVISION

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2); Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Attorney Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Notice of Claim

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Notice of Claim; Filed By: Wilcosky, R.; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/23/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/23/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Deft. Affirmation in Reply

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Deft. Affirmation in Reply; Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) Pltf. Affirmation in Opposition

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) Pltf. Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levin, B.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - OTHER dated 4/10/18

ORDER - OTHER dated 4/10/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Levin, B.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2); Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Summons & Complaint and Verified Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Summons & Complaint and Verified Answer; Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Notice of Entry

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #2) Deft. Notice of Motion

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #2) Deft. Notice of Motion; Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Wilcosky, R.; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST *Corrected*

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST *Corrected*; Filed By: Levin, B.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Wilcosky, R.; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2); Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Deft. Affirmation in Reply; Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) Pltf. Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #2) Deft. Notice of Motion; Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Summons & Complaint and Verified Answer; Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2); Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Cowie, K. - filed by Sacco and Fillas LLP; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wilcosky, R.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Wilcosky, R.; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Notice of Claim; Filed By: Wilcosky, R.; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Wilcosky, R.; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Wilcosky, R.; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 4/10/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/23/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Levin, B.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST *Corrected*; Filed By: Levin, B.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levin, B.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less