This case was last updated from Madison County New York Courts on 10/13/2021 at 10:22:18 (UTC).

Maren Perry v. Justin Smith

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Maren Perry filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Justin Smith. This case was filed in Madison County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald F Cerio. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1802

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Madison, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Donald F Cerio

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maren Perry as parent of RM, an infant

Defendant

Justin Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONIGAN, JAMES LEWIS

 

Court Documents

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A incident report

EXHIBIT(S) - A incident report; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B med rec Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - B med rec Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C equian lien

EXHIBIT(S) - C equian lien; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D photographs

EXHIBIT(S) - D photographs; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - E retainer

EXHIBIT(S) - E retainer; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - F structure

EXHIBIT(S) - F structure; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/14/2021

RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE *Corrected*

RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE *Corrected*; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/14/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2021; Received: 09/15/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2021; Received: 09/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE *Corrected*; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F structure; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E retainer; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D photographs; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C equian lien; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B med rec Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A incident report; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Donigan, J.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less