This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 20:48:40 (UTC).

MARCIA GIVANS-JOHNSON - v. - SHON DOUGLAS HAZELL-CAMPBELL et al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 MARCIA GIVANS-JOHNSON filed an Other lawsuit against SHON DOUGLAS HAZELL-CAMPBELL. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******017E

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcia Givans-johnson

Defendants

UPTOWN'S FINEST TOWING INC.

Shon Douglas Hazell-campbell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IBRAGIMOV, MIKHAIL

Attorney at IBRAGIMOV LAW FIRM, P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 5/16/2019

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 5/16/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) Dr. Eial Faierman's report

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) Dr. Eial Faierman's report; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Dr. Rene Elkin's report

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Dr. Rene Elkin's report; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) lost wages report

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) lost wages report; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) MRI reports

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) MRI reports; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Dr. Harrison's records

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Dr. Harrison's records; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Hospital records

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Hospital records; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 9/15/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 9/15/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ibragimov, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ibragimov, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ibragimov, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ibragimov, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ibragimov, M.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 5/16/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) Dr. Eial Faierman's report; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Dr. Rene Elkin's report; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) lost wages report; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) MRI reports; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Dr. Harrison's records; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Hospital records; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Deposition of plaintiff Marcia Givans-Johnson; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 3/20/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2018; Received: 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 9/15/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Fallon, C.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ibragimov, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ibragimov, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ibragimov, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ibragimov, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ibragimov, M.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less