This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 15:54:36 (UTC).

Marci L. Whitcraft et al - v. - Adam L. Goff et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2017 Marci L Whitcraft filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Adam L Goff. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kenneth W. Whitcraft

Marci L. Whitcraft

Defendants

Brianna L. Daniels

Adam L. Goff

Clayton R. Conlin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVECCHIO, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at CELLINO AND BARNES

Defendant Attorneys

SEYMOUR, BRENT CRYSLER

Attorney at Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP

WRIGHT, VICTOR M.

Attorney at Law Office of Victor M. Wright

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Def Hoff and Daniels Amended Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Def Hoff and Daniels Amended Answer; Filed By: Seymour, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Seymour, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) IME Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) IME Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Imaging Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Imaging Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Medical Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Medical Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Pleadings; Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING signed

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Lovecchio, M.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Answer

ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Answer; Filed By: Mack, S.; Filed: 08/23/2018; Received: 08/23/2018

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross Claim

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross Claim; Filed By: Mack, S.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re def. Clayton R. Conlin

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re def. Clayton R. Conlin; Filed By: Lovecchio, M.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re def. Brianna L. Daniels

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re def. Brianna L. Daniels; Filed By: Lovecchio, M.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re def. Adam L. Goff

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re def. Adam L. Goff; Filed By: Lovecchio, M.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Def Hoff and Daniels Amended Answer; Filed By: Seymour, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Seymour, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) IME Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Imaging Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Medical Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Pleadings; Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Lovecchio, M.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Answer; Filed By: Mack, S.; Filed: 08/23/2018; Received: 08/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross Claim; Filed By: Mack, S.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Wright, V.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re def. Clayton R. Conlin; Filed By: Lovecchio, M.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re def. Brianna L. Daniels; Filed By: Lovecchio, M.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re def. Adam L. Goff; Filed By: Lovecchio, M.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lovecchio, M.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less