This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 05/21/2020 at 15:44:25 (UTC).

MARCELLO DELGADO v. CHRISTINA LEYVA

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 MARCELLO DELGADO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHRISTINA LEYVA. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor G Grossman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Victor G Grossman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marcello Delgado

Daniel Mesa Delarosa

Daniel Delarosa Mesa

Defendant

Christina Leyva

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEIMARK, MARSHALL A

Attorney at NEIMARK & NEIMARK, LLP

Defendant Attorney

JACOBS, STACY L

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BRYAN M. KULAK

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

Notice of Entry

RECEIPT OF FILE - TRANSFER CASE

--none--

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) PROPOSED PC ORDER

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) PROPOSED PC ORDER; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by Neimark & Neimark LLP; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Req for PC w Affirm of GF

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Req for PC w Affirm of GF; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by NEIMARK & NEIMARK, LLP; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by Neimark & Neimark LLP; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

--none--

ORDER - CONSOLIDATION

Consolidated with Westchester Supreme Index # 53362/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by NEIMARK & NEIMARK, LLP; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of az of efile - Putnam

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of az of efile - Putnam; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by NEIMARK & NEIMARK, LLP; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS & SUPP AOS OF 1-1-19 & 1-2-19 ON CHRISTINA LEYVA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS & SUPP AOS OF 1-1-19 & 1-2-19 ON CHRISTINA LEYVA; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by Neimark & Neimark LLP; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by Neimark & Neimark LLP; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF FILE - TRANSFER CASE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CONSOLIDATION Consolidated with Westchester Supreme Index # 53362/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) PROPOSED PC ORDER; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by Neimark & Neimark LLP; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by NEIMARK & NEIMARK, LLP; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of az of efile - Putnam; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by NEIMARK & NEIMARK, LLP; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Req for PC w Affirm of GF; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by NEIMARK & NEIMARK, LLP; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS & SUPP AOS OF 1-1-19 & 1-2-19 ON CHRISTINA LEYVA; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by Neimark & Neimark LLP; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by Neimark & Neimark LLP; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Neimark, M. - filed by Neimark & Neimark LLP; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less