This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 22:20:13 (UTC).

Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company v. Joseph A. Dombek Jr. et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Joseph A Dombek Jr. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1240

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANUFACTURERS + TRADERS TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

NEW YORK STATE PEOPLE OF

Joseph A Dombek SR

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION + FINANCE

Joseph A Dombek JR as Administrator and as Heir of the Estate of Joseph A. Dombek, Sr. a/k/a Joseph A. Dombek

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANLEY, ANTHONY

Attorney at COSTELLO COONEY & FEARON PLLC

 

Court Documents

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Affidavit Canceling Notice of Pendency

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Affidavit Canceling Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Additional Mailing Affidavit of Service by Mail

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Additional Mailing Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Non Service on Does

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Non Service on Does; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Joseph A. Dombek, Jr.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Joseph A. Dombek, Jr.; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA additional mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA additional mailing; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA affidavit of service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA affidavit of service; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on New York State Department of Taxation and Finance; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H 90 day letter

EXHIBIT(S) - H 90 day letter; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G Default Information

EXHIBIT(S) - G Default Information; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F Letters of Administration

EXHIBIT(S) - F Letters of Administration; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Certificate of Death for Joseph A. Dombek Sr.

EXHIBIT(S) - E Certificate of Death for Joseph A. Dombek Sr.; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Governmental Defendants

EXHIBIT(S) - B Governmental Defendants; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A List of Defendants

EXHIBIT(S) - A List of Defendants; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Affidavit Canceling Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Additional Mailing Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Non Service on Does; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Joseph A. Dombek, Jr.; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA additional mailing; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA affidavit of service; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on New York State Department of Taxation and Finance; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on People of the State of New York; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H 90 day letter; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Default Information; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Letters of Administration; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Certificate of Death for Joseph A. Dombek Sr.; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Governmental Defendants; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A List of Defendants; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hanley, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less