This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 19:35:55 (UTC).

Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company - v. - Assesor of the Town of Clay et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Assesor of the Town of Clay. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3045

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company

Defendants

The Town of Clay

Assesor of the Town of Clay

Not Yet Classified

Liverpool Central School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHALIFOUX, SHEILA MARY

Attorney at Chalifoux Law, PC

Defendant Attorney

GERMAIN, ROBERT MARCH

Attorney at GERMAIN & GERMAIN

Not Yet Classified Attorney

GAVETT, KATHERINE E.

Attorney at FERRARA FIORENZA PC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gavett, K.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Gavett, K.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Germain, R.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Germain, R.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

ANSWER ANSWER AND VERIFICATION

ANSWER ANSWER AND VERIFICATION; Filed By: Germain, R.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gavett, K.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Gavett, K.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Germain, R.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Germain, R.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ANSWER AND VERIFICATION; Filed By: Germain, R.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Chalifoux, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less