This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 18:46:34 (UTC).

MANUFACTURERS AND TRADERS TRUST COMPANY, TRADING AS, M & T BANK ('M & T BANK') - v. - LUIS AROCHO

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 MANUFACTURERS AND TRADERS TRUST COMPANY, TRADING AS, M T BANK 'M T BANK' filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against LUIS AROCHO. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANUFACTURERS AND TRADERS TRUST COMPANY, TRADING AS, M & T BANK ('M & T BANK')

Defendant

Luis Arocho A/K/A LUIS DANIEL AROCHO A/K/A LUIS DANIEL AROCHO JUNIOR A/K/A LUIS AROCHO, JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLAUSTEIN, CARYN F

Attorney at KLEINMAN, SALTZMAN & BOLNICK, P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit on Luis Arocho, Jr.

AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit on Luis Arocho, Jr.; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit on Luis Daniel Arocho Junior

AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit on Luis Daniel Arocho Junior; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit on Luis Daniel Arocho

AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit on Luis Daniel Arocho; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit on Luis Arocho

AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit on Luis Arocho; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of additional mailing of summons & verified complaint & notice of commencement of action s ... show more

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of additional mailing of summons & verified complaint & notice of commencement of action s ... show more; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 08/21/2017; Received: 08/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Copy of the statement of account

EXHIBIT(S) - C Copy of the statement of account; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of the notices of default Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of the notices of default Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of the equity account agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of the equity account agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT non military affidavit on Luis Arocho, Jr.; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT non military affidavit on Luis Daniel Arocho Junior; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT non military affidavit on Luis Daniel Arocho; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT non military affidavit on Luis Arocho; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of additional mailing of summons & verified complaint & notice of commencement of action subject to mandatory electronic filing; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 08/21/2017; Received: 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Copy of the statement of account; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of the notices of default Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of the equity account agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Blaustein, C.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less