This case was last updated from Dutchess County Courts on 04/15/2020 at 14:55:54 (UTC).

MALIKA L. WRIGHT - v. - CARLOS M GARCIA et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2017 MALIKA L WRIGHT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARLOS M GARCIA. This case was filed in Dutchess County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2746

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dutchess, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malika L. Wright

Defendants

Carlos M Garcia

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAMBARERI, MARK P

Attorney at Mark P. Cambareri

SOBO, GREGORY MARC

Attorney at SOBO & SOBO L.L.P.

Defendant Attorney

JACOBS, STACY L

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BRYAN M. KULAK

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/24/2020; Received: 03/24/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Ex 1- Petition to Stay Hit-and-Run UM Arbitration

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Ex 1- Petition to Stay Hit-and-Run UM Arbitration; Filed By: Cambareri, M.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation in Opposition

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Cambareri, M.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Def Car Photos

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Def Car Photos; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Pltf Car Photos

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Pltf Car Photos; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Transcript EBT for Defendant

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Transcript EBT for Defendant; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE IME letter Dated November 14, 2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE IME letter Dated November 14, 2018; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2018; Received: 11/13/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 11/12/2018; Received: 11/12/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2018; Received: 07/05/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/24/2020; Received: 03/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Ex 1- Petition to Stay Hit-and-Run UM Arbitration; Filed By: Cambareri, M.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Cambareri, M.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Def Car Photos; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Pltf Car Photos; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Transcript EBT for Defendant; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Transcript EBT for Plaintiff; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE IME letter Dated November 14, 2018; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2018; Received: 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 11/12/2018; Received: 11/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2018; Received: 07/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Jacobs, S.; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less