This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 05/13/2020 at 19:43:31 (UTC).

Maines Paper & Food Service, Inc. - v. - James James et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Maines Paper Food Service, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against James James. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2578

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maines Paper & Food Service, Inc.

Defendants

DOING BUSINESS AS VAN BRUNT GRILL

James James doing business as Van Brunt Grill

John Ware doing business as Van Brunt Grill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENE, RONALD LOUIS

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Additional Mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Additional Mailing; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavits of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - G Exhibit G - Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - G Exhibit G - Invoice; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F - Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F - Invoice; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E - Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E - Invoice; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - Invoice; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - Invoice; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Invoice; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Credit Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Credit Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Additional Mailing; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H Exhibit H - Invoice; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Exhibit G - Invoice; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F - Invoice; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E - Invoice; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - Invoice; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - Invoice; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Invoice; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Credit Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Greene, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less