This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 15:27:26 (UTC).

M & M Canvas & Awnings, Inc. v. American Signcrafters LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 M M Canvas Awnings, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against American Signcrafters LLC. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M & M Canvas & Awnings, Inc.

Defendants

American Signcrafters LLC

Interstate Signcrafters LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FALLON, DAVID P.

Attorney at Law Offices of David P. Fallon, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

NEWBERGER, NETANEL

Attorney at MILMAN LABUDA LAW GROUP, PLLC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Newberger, N.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation regarding extension of time to respond to complaint

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation regarding extension of time to respond to complaint; Filed By: Newberger, N.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation regarding extension of time to respond to complaint

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation regarding extension of time to respond to complaint; Filed By: Newberger, N.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance of Netanel Newberger on behalf of Defendants

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance of Netanel Newberger on behalf of Defendants; Filed By: Newberger, N.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - H Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - G Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - F Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - E Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - D Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - C Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - B Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - A Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Newberger, N.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation regarding extension of time to respond to complaint; Filed By: Newberger, N.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation regarding extension of time to respond to complaint; Filed By: Newberger, N.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance of Netanel Newberger on behalf of Defendants; Filed By: Newberger, N.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Invoice; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fallon, D.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less