Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 03:11:41 (UTC).

M. D. et al - v. - CARLE PLACE UNION FREE SCHOOL DISTRICT et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2017 M D filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CARLE PLACE UNION FREE SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Dinuzzo

Linda Dinuzzo and MICHAEL DINUZZO and LINDA DINUZZO, individually

M. D. an infant by his parents and natural guardians

Defendants

Rosa C. Perifimos

CARLE PLACE UNION FREE SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINE, ANDREW J

Attorney at RAPHAELSON & LEVINE LAW FIRM, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

ROBINSON, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) Notice of Removal to Adverse Party

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) Notice of Removal to Adverse Party; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE Certificate of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE Certificate of Service; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Amended Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) Notice of Removal to Eastern District

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) Notice of Removal to Eastern District; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI); Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Verified Complaint

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) Notice of Removal to Adverse Party; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Certificate of Service; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) Notice of Removal to Eastern District; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI); Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less