This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 09/24/2021 at 10:42:14 (UTC).

Lydia E Mark v. RAMAPO TOWN OF et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Lydia E Mark filed an Other lawsuit against RAMAPO TOWN OF. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M Berliner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert M Berliner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lydia E. Mark

Lydia E Mark

Defendants

The Town of Ramapo

The Town of Ramapo Zoning Board of Appeals

Suri Potash

RAMAPO TOWN OF

RAMAPO TOWN BD OF ASSESSMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOGEL, STEVEN NATHAN

Attorney at Steven N. Mogel, Attorney at Law

Defendant Attorney

Finkelstein, Beth

Attorney at Town of Ramapo Attorney's Office

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Honorable Robert M. Berliner

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Honorable Robert M. Berliner; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2021; Received: 09/16/2021

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request for adjournment of time to Answer to 10/8/21

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request for adjournment of time to Answer to 10/8/21; Filed By: Finkelstein, B. - filed by Town of Ramapo Attorney's Office; Filed: 09/15/2021; Received: 09/15/2021

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/26/2021; Received: 08/26/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Finkelstein, B. - filed by Town of Ramapo Attorney's Office; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Finkelstein, B. - filed by Town of Ramapo Attorney's Office; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 10 3/4/21 Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - 10 3/4/21 Transcript; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 9 2/26/21 Dresdner Memo

EXHIBIT(S) - 9 2/26/21 Dresdner Memo; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 2/26/21 Mogel Correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 2/26/21 Mogel Correspondence; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 2/18/21 Karben Correspondence, with exhibits

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 2/18/21 Karben Correspondence, with exhibits; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 2/18/21 Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 2/18/21 Transcript; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 1/12/21 Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 1/12/21 Petition; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 1/14/21 Mogel Correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 1/14/21 Mogel Correspondence; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 1/14/21 Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 1/14/21 Transcript; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 ZBA Application-Potash

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 ZBA Application-Potash; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Decision

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Decision; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

NOTICE OF PETITION Notice of Petition

NOTICE OF PETITION Notice of Petition; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

PETITION Verified Petition

PETITION Verified Petition; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Honorable Robert M. Berliner; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2021; Received: 09/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request for adjournment of time to Answer to 10/8/21; Filed By: Finkelstein, B. - filed by Town of Ramapo Attorney's Office; Filed: 09/15/2021; Received: 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/26/2021; Received: 08/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Finkelstein, B. - filed by Town of Ramapo Attorney's Office; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Finkelstein, B. - filed by Town of Ramapo Attorney's Office; Filed: 08/13/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 10 3/4/21 Transcript; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 9 2/26/21 Dresdner Memo; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 8 2/26/21 Mogel Correspondence; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 7 2/18/21 Karben Correspondence, with exhibits; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 2/18/21 Transcript; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 1/12/21 Petition; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 1/14/21 Mogel Correspondence; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 1/14/21 Transcript; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 ZBA Application-Potash; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Decision; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) Notice of Petition; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Verified Petition; Filed By: Mogel, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less