This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 05/20/2023 at 13:33:04 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC v. Walfre Martinez

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Walfre Martinez. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Otsego, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Walfre Martinez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STILLER, CRAIG SCOTT

BANN, STEVEN PHILIP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Walfre Martinez

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Walfre Martinez; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/01/2021; Received: 11/01/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/01/2021; Received: 11/01/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/04/2021; Received: 11/04/2021

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/10/2021; Received: 11/10/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/04/2022; Received: 04/04/2022

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/12/2022; Received: 04/12/2022

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/12/2022; Received: 04/12/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/04/2022; Received: 04/04/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 04/01/2022; Received: 04/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/10/2021; Received: 11/10/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC; Filed: 11/04/2021; Received: 11/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC; Filed: 11/01/2021; Received: 11/01/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Walfre Martinez; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC; Filed: 11/01/2021; Received: 11/01/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less