Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 14:43:32 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC v. Patricia E Wesson

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Patricia E Wesson. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Patricia E Wesson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EINSTEIN, STEPHEN

Attorney at STEPHEN EINSTEIN & ASSOCIATES P.C.

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Seller

AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Seller; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#328921

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#328921; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Seller; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#328921; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less