This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 02:17:05 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC v. Joseph Dellolio

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Joseph Dellolio. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Joseph Dellolio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EINSTEIN, STEPHEN

Attorney at STEPHEN EINSTEIN & ASSOCIATES P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 21, 2019

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 21, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#303651

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#303651; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 21, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#303651; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less