This case was last updated from Madison County New York Courts on 07/28/2022 at 00:19:55 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC v. Durk Oord

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Durk Oord. This case was filed in Madison County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Otsego, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1886

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Madison, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Durk Oord

Munnsville, NY 13409-2919

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BANN, STEVEN P

STILLER, CRAIG SCOTT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Durk Oord

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Durk Oord; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 10/15/2021; Received: 10/15/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 10/15/2021; Received: 10/15/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 10/18/2021; Received: 10/18/2021

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/21/2021; Received: 10/21/2021

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIDAVIT 1-AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER

AFFIDAVIT 1-AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIDAVIT 2-AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER

AFFIDAVIT 2-AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT UPDATED REVIEW SHEET

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT UPDATED REVIEW SHEET; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 07/01/2022; Received: 07/01/2022

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 07/01/2022; Received: 07/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT UPDATED REVIEW SHEET; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 2-AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1-AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/21/2021; Received: 10/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC; Filed: 10/18/2021; Received: 10/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC; Filed: 10/15/2021; Received: 10/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Durk Oord; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC; Filed: 10/15/2021; Received: 10/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less