Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 14:35:57 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC v. David Graziano

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against David Graziano. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

David Graziano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EINSTEIN, STEPHEN

Attorney at STEPHEN EINSTEIN & ASSOCIATES P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Seller

AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Seller; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#323731

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#323731; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Seller; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#323731; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less