This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 16:31:10 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC v. CYNTHIA CROSSLEY

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CYNTHIA CROSSLEY. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Cynthia Crossley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WARSHAW, DAVID BARRY

Attorney at PRESSLER & PRESSLER LLP

STILLER, CRAIG SCOTT

Attorney at PRESSLER FELT & WARSHAW, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CYNTHIA CROSSLEY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CYNTHIA CROSSLEY; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/30/2019; Received: 08/30/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT CYNTHIA CROSSLEY

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT CYNTHIA CROSSLEY; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CYNTHIA CROSSLEY; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/30/2019; Received: 08/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT CYNTHIA CROSSLEY; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less