Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 05/02/2020 at 19:49:56 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC - v. - CHRISTOPHER COSGROVE

Case Summary

On 06/20/2018 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER COSGROVE. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********52CV

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Christopher Cosgrove

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

WATTS, VALERIE ELIZABETH

Attorney at RUBIN AND ROTHMAN, LLC

LEIDERMAN, JOEL D

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q64665728657 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q64665728657 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/20/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q64665728657 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less