This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/21/2023 at 17:24:28 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC v. Cheryl Lockhart

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cheryl Lockhart. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1132

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Cheryl Lockhart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCULLY, JAMES PAUL

Defendant Attorney

BORGESE, FRANK JUNIOR

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Scully, J.; Filed: 11/23/2022; Received: 11/23/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Scully, J. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 12/26/2022; Received: 12/26/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Scully, J. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 12/26/2022; Received: 12/26/2022

ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)

ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/11/2023; Received: 01/11/2023

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Borgese, F.; Filed: 01/20/2023; Received: 01/20/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Borgese, F.; Filed: 01/20/2023; Received: 01/20/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Borgese, F.; Filed: 01/20/2023; Received: 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Borgese, F.; Filed: 01/20/2023; Received: 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/11/2023; Received: 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Scully, J. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 12/26/2022; Received: 12/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Scully, J. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 12/26/2022; Received: 12/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Scully, J.; Filed: 11/23/2022; Received: 11/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less