This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 19:09:52 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC v. BONNIE CAMACHO

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BONNIE CAMACHO. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0020

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Bonnie Camacho

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

WATTS, VALERIE ELIZABETH

Attorney at RUBIN AND ROTHMAN, LLC

JORDAN, TARAH EVE

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

 

Court Documents

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT DENIED-ADDITIONAL NOTICE RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT DENIED-ADDITIONAL NOTICE RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) Additional Notice returned as Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward

NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) Additional Notice returned as Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING TO LAST KNOWN HOME ADDRESS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING TO LAST KNOWN HOME ADDRESS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

AFFIRMATION Non Miltary Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Non Miltary Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

AFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 04/20/2019; Received: 04/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 04/20/2019; Received: 04/20/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q64671756605

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q64671756605; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT DENIED-ADDITIONAL NOTICE RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) Additional Notice returned as Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING TO LAST KNOWN HOME ADDRESS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Non Miltary Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 04/20/2019; Received: 04/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 04/20/2019; Received: 04/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q64671756605; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less