This case was last updated from Dutchess County Courts on 04/16/2020 at 03:51:56 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC - v. - April McClendon

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against April McClendon. This case was filed in Dutchess County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2809

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Dutchess, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

April Mcclendon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EINSTEIN, STEPHEN

Attorney at STEPHEN EINSTEIN & ASSOCIATES P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk

JUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 7/3/18

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 7/3/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING 6/15/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING 6/15/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* SEA#258430

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* SEA#258430; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by J&E Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by J&E Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SEA#258430

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SEA#258430; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 7/3/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING 6/15/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* SEA#258430; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by J&E Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by J&E Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SEA#258430; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less