This case was last updated from Dutchess County Courts on 04/16/2020 at 03:51:53 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC - v. - ANTHONY SERRANO

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANTHONY SERRANO. This case was filed in Dutchess County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2808

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dutchess, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Anthony Serrano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARASZEWSKI, DARLEEN VERONICA

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT as entered by County clerk

JUDGMENT as entered by County clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/01/2018; Received: 05/01/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER

AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit with SCRA Results

AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit with SCRA Results; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing of Additional Notice

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing of Additional Notice; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

EXHIBIT(S) Redaction Cover Page

EXHIBIT(S) Redaction Cover Page; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING AS ENTERED BY COUNTY CLERK

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING AS ENTERED BY COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/06/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANTHONY SERRANO

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANTHONY SERRANO; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT ANTHONY SERRANO

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT ANTHONY SERRANO; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT as entered by County clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/01/2018; Received: 05/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit with SCRA Results; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing of Additional Notice; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) Redaction Cover Page; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by William C. Grossman Law, PLLC; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING AS ENTERED BY COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/06/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANTHONY SERRANO; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT ANTHONY SERRANO; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less