This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 14:38:53 (UTC).

Luke M. Troyer et al v. Lucy A. Hill et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 Luke M Troyer filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Lucy A Hill. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1066

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Luke M Troyer

Tina A Troyer

Defendants

Lucy A Hill

Lucille A Hall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THIERFELDT, LORI L.

Attorney at THIERFELDT LAW P.C.

Defendant Attorney

KITCHEN, DENIS A

Attorney at DENIS A KITCHEN JR

 

Court Documents

ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1)

ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

ORDER - AMENDED (Motion #1)

ORDER - AMENDED (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1)

ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Aff of service

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Aff of service; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Land contract

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Land contract; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Schedule of Costs and expenses

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Schedule of Costs and expenses; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service on Defendant

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service on Defendant; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A legal description

EXHIBIT(S) - A legal description; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Schedule C Amounts owed

EXHIBIT(S) - C Schedule C Amounts owed; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Land contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Land contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Legal Description

EXHIBIT(S) - A Legal Description; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FINAL (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AMENDED (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FINAL (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Aff of service; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Land contract; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Schedule of Costs and expenses; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Land contract; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service on Defendant; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A legal description; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Schedule C Amounts owed; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Land contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Legal Description; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Thierfeldt, L.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less