This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 00:35:54 (UTC).

LUKE HUH v. ALAN J PATRICOF

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 LUKE HUH filed an Other lawsuit against ALAN J PATRICOF. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas Feinman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas Feinman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luke Huh

Defendant and Petitioner

Alan J Patricof

Respondent

ISON HUH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM, DANIEL D

Attorney at KIM & KIM LAW GROUP, P.C.

Petitioner Attorney

ALEX M TEMPLE

Defendant Attorneys

MATOS, EDGAR

Attorney at Perez & Cariello

TEMPLE, ALEX M

Attorney at PEREZ & CARIELLO

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - Ison Huh

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - Ison Huh; Filed By: Temple, A.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C EXHIBIT C

EXHIBIT(S) - C EXHIBIT C; Filed By: Temple, A.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B

EXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B; Filed By: Temple, A.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A

EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A; Filed By: Temple, A.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Temple, A.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Post-EBT Notice for Discovery & Inspection

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Post-EBT Notice for Discovery & Inspection; Filed By: Temple, A.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL Joint Trial with Index No. 616485/2018

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL Joint Trial with Index No. 616485/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Received: 08/02/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kim, D.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer, Combined Discovery Demands, Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars

ANSWER Verified Answer, Combined Discovery Demands, Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Matos, E.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kim, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kim, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Kim, D.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - Ison Huh; Filed By: Temple, A.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C EXHIBIT C; Filed By: Temple, A.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B; Filed By: Temple, A.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A; Filed By: Temple, A.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Temple, A.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Post-EBT Notice for Discovery & Inspection; Filed By: Temple, A.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - JOINT TRIAL Joint Trial with Index No. 616485/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kim, D.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer, Combined Discovery Demands, Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Matos, E.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kim, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kim, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Kim, D.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less