This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 21:45:10 (UTC).

LUISA GUZMAN - v. - NEW YORK CITY HEALTH and HOSPITALS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 LUISA GUZMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NEW YORK CITY HEALTH and HOSPITALS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******017E

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luisa Guzman

Defendant

NEW YORK CITY HEALTH and HOSPITALS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DANKNER, JAY WARREN

Attorney at DANKNER MILSTEIN PC

BUITRAGO, MARCELO ALEJANDRO

Attorney at BUITRAGO & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

DANKNER, JAY W

Attorney at DANKNER & MILSTEIN P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

KASHER, CHEN

Attorney at NEW YORK CITY LAW DEPARTMENT

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Response to PC Order

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Response to PC Order; Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Notice of Claim

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Notice of Claim; Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Compliance Conference Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Compliance Conference Order; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Preliminary Conference Order

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint/ Answer/ BP

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint/ Answer/ BP; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated 5/7/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated 5/7/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 12/4/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 12/4/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Dankner, J.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Dankner, J.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Dankner, J.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Dankner, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Dankner, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Dankner, J.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Response to PC Order; Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Notice of Claim; Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Kasher, C.; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Compliance Conference Order; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint/ Answer/ BP; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated 5/7/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 12/4/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Dankner, J.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Dankner, J.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Dankner, J.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Dankner, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Dankner, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Dankner, J.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less