This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:16:12 (UTC).

LUIS TORRES v. HARLORN, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 LUIS TORRES filed an Other lawsuit against HARLORN, LLC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruben Franco. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Ruben Franco

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luis Torres and/or WILMER TORRES, Proposed Administrator of the Estate of AMPARO BURGOS, deceased,

Defendants

HARLORN, LLC

CEE & CEE DEPARTMENT STORE, INC.

WESTERN BEEF RETAIL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREWS-SANTILLO, ASHLEY

Attorney at Munawar & Hashmat LLP

Defendant Attorneys

MANTIONE, STEVEN K.

Attorney at AHMUTY, DEMERS & McMANUS

STIEFELD, MARC E

Attorney at BURKE, GORDON & CONWAY

WIENER, MELANIE IRINA

Attorney at ABRAMS, FENSTERMAN, FENSTERMAN, EISMAN FORMATO, FERRARA, WOLF, LLP

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Exhibit A - Memorandum Decision/Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Exhibit A - Memorandum Decision/Order; Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) Correspondence to Hon. Ruben Franco

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) Correspondence to Hon. Ruben Franco; Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

DEMAND FOR: Certification Pursuant to Part 130 and Various Demands

DEMAND FOR: Certification Pursuant to Part 130 and Various Demands; Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Exhibit C - Confirmation of Filing

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Exhibit C - Confirmation of Filing; Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 8/29/2019

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 8/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer to Verified Complaint

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer to Verified Complaint; Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Wiener, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #003) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 8/29/2019

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #003) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 8/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Exhibit B - Proposed Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Exhibit B - Proposed Judgment; Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Wiener, M.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003); Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 8/29/2019

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 8/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Exhibit C - Confirmation of Filing; Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Exhibit B - Proposed Judgment; Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Exhibit A - Memorandum Decision/Order; Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) Correspondence to Hon. Ruben Franco; Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment with Notice of Settlement, Judgment, and Affirmation Waiving Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Wiener, M.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #003) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 8/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 8/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 8/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003); Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Wiener, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Wiener, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Certification Pursuant to Part 130 and Various Demands; Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer to Verified Complaint; Filed By: Mantione, S.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Andrews-Santillo, A.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less