Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 16:38:01 (UTC).

LUIS CABRERA et al - v. - PROVIDENT ALPINE PARTNERS, LP

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 LUIS CABRERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROVIDENT ALPINE PARTNERS, LP. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maria Capelo

Luis Cabrera

Defendant

PROVIDENT ALPINE PARTNERS, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAYNE, STEVEN R

Attorney at GINARTE GALLARDO GONZALEZ WINOGRAD L.L.P

Defendant Attorneys

SOFIELD, THOMAS ROBERT

Attorney at CRAFA & SOFIELD, PC.

CORBETT, PATRICK J

Attorney at Law office of Margaret G. Klein & Associates

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - 1-3 Ex. 1-Complaint; Ex. 2-Answer; Ex. 3-BP

EXHIBIT(S) - 1-3 Ex. 1-Complaint; Ex. 2-Answer; Ex. 3-BP; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT *Corrected* Third Party Summons and Verified Complaint

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT *Corrected* Third Party Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

COUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES Change of Venue: Nassau County

COUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES Change of Venue: Nassau County; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) (Motion #001NY) Notice to Clerk with copy of order and aff of service

NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) (Motion #001NY) Notice to Clerk with copy of order and aff of service; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

RJI FROM PRIOR COUNTY (COPY) Original document type was RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI FROM PRIOR COUNTY (COPY) Original document type was RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Verified Answer with affirmation of service

ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Verified Answer with affirmation of service; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer with affirmation of service

ANSWER Verified Answer with affirmation of service; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) Notice of Removal with supporting documents and affid of service

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) Notice of Removal with supporting documents and affid of service; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROVIDENT ALPINE PARTNERS LP

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROVIDENT ALPINE PARTNERS LP; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1-3 Ex. 1-Complaint; Ex. 2-Answer; Ex. 3-BP; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT *Corrected* Third Party Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES Change of Venue: Nassau County; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) (Motion #001NY) Notice to Clerk with copy of order and aff of service; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001NY) Order granting change of venue with Notice of Entry and aff of service; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI FROM PRIOR COUNTY (COPY) Original document type was RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Verified Answer with affirmation of service; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer with affirmation of service; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) Notice of Removal with supporting documents and affid of service; Filed By: Sofield, T.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROVIDENT ALPINE PARTNERS LP; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Payne, S.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less