This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 03:46:05 (UTC).

Luis A. Urquiza Huaman v. Iris Cortes

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Luis A Urquiza Huaman filed an Other lawsuit against Iris Cortes. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine M Didomenico. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Catherine M Didomenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luis A. Urquiza huaman

Defendant

Iris Cortes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABRIEL, SUREN

Attorney at Gabriel Law Firm, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

FRIEDMAN, BRENDAN FORREST

Attorney at Lasater & Martin P.C.

LESPERANCE, NICOLE EMLEY

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE

CHOE, STEVE HONG SUK

Attorney at Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Choe, S. - filed by Dugan, J.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Choe, S. - filed by Dugan, J.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Omnibus Demands

DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Omnibus Demands; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Response to Combined Demands

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Response to Combined Demands; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

BILL OF PARTICULARS Verified Bill of Particulars

BILL OF PARTICULARS Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gabriel, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gabriel, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Choe, S. - filed by Dugan, J.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Choe, S. - filed by Dugan, J.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Omnibus Demands; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Response to Combined Demands; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gabriel, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gabriel, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gabriel, S.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less