This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 16:06:19 (UTC).

LRP CONSTRUCTION CORP. - v. - NEW YORK UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 LRP CONSTRUCTION CORP filed an Other lawsuit against NEW YORK UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LRP CONSTRUCTION CORP.

Defendant

NEW YORK UNIVERSITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PEREZ, JOELLE A.

Attorney at Joelle A. Perez, Esq.

SUTTON, DAVID JOHN

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J. SUTTON, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

TRICARICO, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at Kennedys CMK LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION

--none--

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

--none--

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Google Map

EXHIBIT(S)

Google Map

EXHIBIT(S)

Google Map

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION

Affirmation CPLR 511

DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL

NYU Demand For Change of Venue

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

NYU Answer With Counterclaims

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

--none--

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

--none--

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION; Filed By: Perez, J.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Perez, J.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Tricarico, M.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Perez, J.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #001) Google Map; Filed By: Tricarico, M.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) Google Map; Filed By: Tricarico, M.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Google Map; Filed By: Tricarico, M.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Subpoena; Filed By: Tricarico, M.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C); Filed By: Perez, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Perez, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Perez, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation CPLR 511; Filed By: Perez, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL NYU Demand For Change of Venue; Filed By: Tricarico, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) NYU Answer With Counterclaims; Filed By: Tricarico, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Tricarico, M.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Tricarico, M.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Tricarico, M.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sutton, D.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less