Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 16:47:45 (UTC).

LOURDES CUAUTLE v. STEVEN MITCHELL et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 LOURDES CUAUTLE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against STEVEN MITCHELL. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Reginald Boddie. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Reginald Boddie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lourdes Cuautle

Defendants

HIGH QUALITY NUTRITION COMPANY LLC

Steven Mitchell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMITH, DENNIS R.

Attorney at Law Offices of Dennis Smith

PRIESTON, EVANS D.

Attorney at Law Office of Evans D.Prieston, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

DELACRUZ, MICHAELA PIZARRO

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation to Restore

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation to Restore; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 06/10/2020; Received: 06/10/2020

STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Lifting Automatic Stay

STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Lifting Automatic Stay; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 06/10/2020; Received: 06/10/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Correspondence re. Bankruptcy Petition

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Correspondence re. Bankruptcy Petition; Filed By: Delacruz, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

NOTICE OF CHARGING LIEN

NOTICE OF CHARGING LIEN; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E Stipulation to Restore

EXHIBIT(S) - E Stipulation to Restore; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D E-law screen printout

EXHIBIT(S) - D E-law screen printout; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Joint Trial Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C Joint Trial Order; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

ORDER - INTERIM

ORDER - INTERIM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL index 520533/18, 521773/18, 504014/19, 505337/19, 507881/19, 508789/19 are joined for trial

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL index 520533/18, 521773/18, 504014/19, 505337/19, 507881/19, 508789/19 are joined for trial; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Smith, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Smith, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Smith, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Delacruz, M.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation to Restore; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 06/10/2020; Received: 06/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Lifting Automatic Stay; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 06/10/2020; Received: 06/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Correspondence re. Bankruptcy Petition; Filed By: Delacruz, M.; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHARGING LIEN; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Stipulation to Restore; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D E-law screen printout; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Joint Trial Order; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Answer; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP; Filed By: Prieston, E.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - JOINT TRIAL index 515465/2019, 520533/18, 521773/18, 504014/19, 505337/19, 507881/19, and 508789/19 are joined for trial; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - INTERIM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - JOINT TRIAL index 520533/18, 521773/18, 504014/19, 505337/19, 507881/19, 508789/19 are joined for trial; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Smith, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Smith, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Smith, D. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Delacruz, M.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less