This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:48:02 (UTC).

LOUIS SCARBOUR - v. - WEN JIANG

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 LOUIS SCARBOUR filed an Other lawsuit against WEN JIANG. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Louis Scarbour

Defendant

Wen Jiang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLERSTEIN, HEDVA

Attorney at HEDVA WELLERSTEIN

Defendant Attorney

BAMUNDO, STEVEN

Attorney at BAMUNDO ZWAL & SCHERMEHORN LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 05/03/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Compliance Conference

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Compliance Conference; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Affirmation of Good Faith

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Note of Issue

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Note of Issue; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Plaintiffs Appearance for Deposition

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Plaintiffs Appearance for Deposition; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Final Prenote Order

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Final Prenote Order; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

ANSWER Answer with Discovery Demands

ANSWER Answer with Discovery Demands; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 02/05/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Preliminary Conference Order

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Copy of Deposition Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Copy of Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Plaintiffs Appearance for Deposition; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Note of Issue; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Final Prenote Order; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Copy of Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Compliance Conference; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION Notice of Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 05/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 02/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer with Discovery Demands; Filed By: Bamundo, S.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less