This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 09:27:12 (UTC).

LOUIS A. RESTIVO v. OLGA LINEROS

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 LOUIS A RESTIVO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against OLGA LINEROS. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James Mccormack. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James Mccormack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Louis A. Restivo

Defendant

Olga Lineros

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOULO, RAYMOND SALVATORE

Attorney at RAYMOND S VOULO

Defendant Attorneys

MUSA-OBREGON, SHAUKY MICHAEL

Attorney at Musa-Obregon Law PC

ASHANTI, KARL JOSEPH

Attorney at Musa-Obregon Law, P.C.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Voulo, R.; Filed: 10/05/2021; Received: 10/05/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Voulo, R.; Filed: 10/05/2021; Received: 10/05/2021

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2021; Received: 10/04/2021

ANSWER (AMENDED)

ANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Musa-Obregon, S.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Voulo, R.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY; Filed By: Voulo, R.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

ANSWER (AMENDED)

ANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Ashanti, K.; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION; Filed By: Ashanti, K.; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

MOTION PAPERS W/EXHIBITS (PRIOR TO CONVERSION)

MOTION PAPERS W/EXHIBITS (PRIOR TO CONVERSION); Filed By: Voulo, R.; Filed: 08/10/2021; Received: 08/10/2021

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Voulo, R.; Filed: 10/05/2021; Received: 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Voulo, R.; Filed: 10/05/2021; Received: 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2021; Received: 10/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Musa-Obregon, S.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Voulo, R.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY; Filed By: Voulo, R.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Ashanti, K.; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION; Filed By: Ashanti, K.; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION PAPERS W/EXHIBITS (PRIOR TO CONVERSION); Filed By: Voulo, R.; Filed: 08/10/2021; Received: 08/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less