This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 01:44:31 (UTC).

LORRAINE HUGHES - v. - TARGET CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/01/2017 LORRAINE HUGHES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando Marrazzo. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Orlando Marrazzo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lorraine Hughes

Defendant

TARGET CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBLATT, HELEN M.

Defendant Attorney

LEVINE, MITCHELL B

Attorney at FISHMAN McINTYRE PC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001)

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

ORDER - OTHER Bankruptcy Order

ORDER - OTHER Bankruptcy Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Civil Cover Sheet

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Civil Cover Sheet; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Corporate Disclosure Statement

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Corporate Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) Notice of Removal

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) Notice of Removal; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR TARGET CORPORATION

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR TARGET CORPORATION; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Bankruptcy Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PLEADINGS Civil Cover Sheet; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PLEADINGS Corporate Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) Notice of Removal; Filed By: Levine, M.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR TARGET CORPORATION; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less