This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 07/29/2023 at 12:05:39 (UTC).

LORAINE HUMPHREY et al v. Andrew M Cuomo et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 LORAINE HUMPHREY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Andrew M Cuomo. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard C. Kloch. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2020

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Richard C. Kloch

 

Party Details

Defendants

Catholic High School Athletic Association

New York State Public High School Athletic Association

State of New York

New York State Department of Health

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JAMES, RENEE L.

ZIMMERMANN, GEORGE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #2)

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2020; Received: 11/12/2020

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #1)

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2020; Received: 11/12/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #1)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/29/2020; Received: 10/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - NN (Motion #1) NY Times Article

EXHIBIT(S) - NN (Motion #1) NY Times Article; Filed By: Zimmermann, G.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - MM (Motion #1) NY Times Article

EXHIBIT(S) - MM (Motion #1) NY Times Article; Filed By: Zimmermann, G.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - JJ (Motion #1) JJ through LL

EXHIBIT(S) - JJ (Motion #1) JJ through LL; Filed By: Zimmermann, G.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - II (Motion #1) Football Rules Book

EXHIBIT(S) - II (Motion #1) Football Rules Book; Filed By: Zimmermann, G.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) A through HH

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) A through HH; Filed By: Zimmermann, G.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/08/2020; Received: 10/08/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Amended Class Action Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Amended Class Action Complaint; Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/08/2020; Received: 10/08/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) MOL in Support

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) MOL in Support; Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/08/2020; Received: 10/08/2020

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1); Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/06/2020; Received: 10/06/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 09/28/2020; Received: 09/28/2020

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2020; Received: 11/12/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2020; Received: 11/12/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/29/2020; Received: 10/29/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - NN (Motion #1) NY Times Article; Filed By: Zimmermann, G.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - MM (Motion #1) NY Times Article; Filed By: Zimmermann, G.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - JJ (Motion #1) JJ through LL; Filed By: Zimmermann, G.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - II (Motion #1) Football Rules Book; Filed By: Zimmermann, G.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) A through HH; Filed By: Zimmermann, G.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) of Debra S. Blog; Filed By: Zimmermann, G.; Filed: 10/28/2020; Received: 10/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Cuomo announcement- No Fall Football; Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/08/2020; Received: 10/08/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/08/2020; Received: 10/08/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Amended Class Action Complaint; Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/08/2020; Received: 10/08/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) MOL in Support; Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/08/2020; Received: 10/08/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1); Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 10/06/2020; Received: 10/06/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mermigis, J.; Filed: 09/28/2020; Received: 09/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less