This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 00:38:52 (UTC).

LONG ISLAND UNIVERSITY -v.- KATHRYN MERCURY

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 LONG ISLAND UNIVERSITY -v - KATHRYN MERCURY was filed as a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONG ISLAND UNIVERSITY

Defendant

Kathryn Mercury

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

WATTS, VALERIE ELIZABETH

Attorney at RUBIN AND ROTHMAN, LLC

LEIDERMAN, JOEL D

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - EXPARTE ORDER - EXPARTE entered in the office of the County Clerk on October 01, 2019...VACATING JUDGMENT

ORDER - EXPARTE ORDER - EXPARTE entered in the office of the County Clerk on October 01, 2019...VACATING JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

ORDER - EXPARTE

ORDER - EXPARTE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Judgement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Judgement; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

AFFIRMATION Exparte Affirmation

AFFIRMATION Exparte Affirmation; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Exparte Order

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Exparte Order; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 29, 2019

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 29, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

AFFIRMATION Statue of Limitations Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Statue of Limitations Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

AFFIRMATION Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

AFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS CONSTITUTING THE CLAIM THE DEFAULT AND THE AMOUNT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS CONSTITUTING THE CLAIM THE DEFAULT AND THE AMOUNT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT BBC100360362

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT BBC100360362; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXPARTE ORDER - EXPARTE entered in the office of the County Clerk on October 01, 2019...VACATING JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXPARTE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Judgement; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Exparte Affirmation; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Exparte Order; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 29, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Statue of Limitations Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS CONSTITUTING THE CLAIM THE DEFAULT AND THE AMOUNT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT BBC100360362; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less