This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 19:20:35 (UTC).

LONG ISLAND LAPAROSCOPIC SURGERY PLLC - v. - MICHAEL HILL et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 LONG ISLAND LAPAROSCOPIC SURGERY PLLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL HILL. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONG ISLAND LAPAROSCOPIC SURGERY PLLC

Defendants

Sonia Hill

Michael Hill

Not Yet Classified

INTERBORO ATTORNEY SERVICE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorney

RUBENS, EMILY BLAIRE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF EMILY RUBENS

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Rubens, E. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rubens, E. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rubens, E. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rubens, E. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rubens, E. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Rubens, E. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rubens, E. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rubens, E. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rubens, E. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rubens, E. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less