This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:22:30 (UTC).

LONG ISLAND ANESTHESIOLOGISTS PLLC - v. - DONNA FARRELL

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 LONG ISLAND ANESTHESIOLOGISTS PLLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DONNA FARRELL. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONG ISLAND ANESTHESIOLOGISTS PLLC

Defendant

Donna Farrell

Not Yet Classified

INTERBORO ATTORNEY SERVICE CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINBOOK, NEIL STUART

Attorney at THE LEVINBOOK LAW FIRM, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Levinbook, N. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 04/09/2018; Received: 04/09/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 01/05/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Levinbook, N. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levinbook, N. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Levinbook, N. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levinbook, N. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Levinbook, N. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 04/09/2018; Received: 04/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Levinbook, N. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levinbook, N. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Levinbook, N. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levinbook, N. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less