This case was last updated from Essex County New York Courts on 11/22/2021 at 16:06:10 (UTC).

LIVINGSTON HILLS NURSING & REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC v. ELIZABETH GOFF

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 LIVINGSTON HILLS NURSING REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELIZABETH GOFF. This case was filed in Essex County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Glen Bruening. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0167

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Glen Bruening

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIVINGSTON HILLS NURSING & REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC

Defendant

Elizabeth Goff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERN, KENNETH MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 04/07/2021; Received: 04/07/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ELIZABETH GOFF

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ELIZABETH GOFF; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 05/03/2021; Received: 05/03/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 05/03/2021; Received: 05/03/2021

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Ex A- Summons with Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Ex A- Summons with Notice; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Ex B- Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Ex B- Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Ex C- Affidavit of Non Military

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Ex C- Affidavit of Non Military; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Ex D- Affidavit of Merit

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Ex D- Affidavit of Merit; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Ex E-Affidavit of Additional Mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Ex E-Affidavit of Additional Mailing; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #1)

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Ex E-Affidavit of Additional Mailing; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Ex D- Affidavit of Merit; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Ex C- Affidavit of Non Military; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Ex B- Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Ex A- Summons with Notice; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 07/15/2021; Received: 07/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 05/03/2021; Received: 05/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ELIZABETH GOFF; Filed By: Kern, K. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 05/03/2021; Received: 05/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Kern, K.; Filed: 04/07/2021; Received: 04/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less