This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 17:44:12 (UTC).

Lisa Spence et al v. Chenango Valley School District

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 Lisa Spence filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Chenango Valley School District. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1114

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ryan-infant Spence

Lisa-mother Spence

Defendant

Chenango Valley School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENJAMIN, RONALD R

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RONALD R. BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorneys

O'HARA, KEITH ANDREW

Attorney at COUGHLIN & GERHART, L.L.P.

MYRDEK, CAROLINE LAUREN

Attorney at Coughlin & Gerhart, LLP

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Benjamin, R.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Discovery and Inspection

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Benjamin, R.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Benjamin, R.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Benjamin, R.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Myrdek, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Benjamin, R.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Benjamin, R.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less